US HB3991 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Education Relief and Restoration Act of 2015 This bill declares that, if a veteran is forced to discontinue a course as a result of a a permanent school closure and did not receive credit or lost training time toward completion of the education program, Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) educational assistance payments shall not, for a specified period of time, be: charged against the individual's entitlement to educational assistance, or counted against the aggregate period for which such assistance may be provided. The bill applies to courses and programs of education discontinued beginning with FY2015. The VA may continue to pay educational assistance and subsistence allowances to eligible veterans and eligible persons enrolled in specified courses for up to 4 weeks in any 12-month period when schools are temporarily closed under an established policy based on an executive order of the President or due to an emergency situation. The VA may also continue to pay a monthly housing stipend following a permanent school closure, but only until the earlier of: (1) the date of the end of the term, quarter, or semester during which the school closure occurred; and (2) the date that is four months after the school closure.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Education Relief and Restoration Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2253 (Related) 2015-11-18 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2921 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467.
SB2921 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3991/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3991/BILLS-114hr3991ih.pdf |