US HB3978 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equal Access to Support Youth Voting Act or EASY Voting Act - Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit the dissemination of false information with the intent of discouraging students who attend an institution of higher education (IHE) from voting or registering to vote in a federal election. Amends the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to require state and local election officials to accept a current and valid student photo identification issued by the IHE the student attends as a current and valid photo identification when such identification is required to obtain a ballot or vote in a federal election.
Title
EASY Voting Act
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5799 (Related) 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB3608 (Related) 2012-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3608 (Related) 2012-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3978/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3978/BILLS-112hr3978ih.pdf |