US HB3977 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence Judicial Support Act of 2012 - Amends the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000, as amended by the Violence Against Women and Department of Justice Reauthorization Act of 2005, to authorize the Attorney General to make grants to state and local governments, Indian tribal governments, courts and other specified providers for: (1) supervised visitation and safe visitation exchange of children and youth by and between parents in situations involving domestic violence, dating violence, child sexual abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; and (2) court-related and child protective services workers education on the dynamics of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault (including child sexual abuse), and stalking. Amends the Victims of Child Abuse Act of 1990 to: (1) ensure that by January 1, 2015, a court-appointed special advocate shall be available to every victim of child abuse or neglect in the United States that needs one; and (2) reauthorize through FY2017 the court-appointed special advocate program and the child abuse training programs for judicial personnel and practitioners.
Title
Domestic Violence Judicial Support Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1925 (Related) 2012-04-26 - Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 31. Record Vote Number: 87.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Families
Family services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Families
Family services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Sex offenses
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3977/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3977/BILLS-112hr3977ih.pdf |