US HB3949 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-89. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-89. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
VALOR Act Veterans Apprenticeship and Labor Opportunity Reform Act (Sec. 2) This bill provides that the state approving agency for a multi-state non-federal apprenticeship program is: (1) for program approval purposes, the state approving agency for the state in which the headquarters of the apprenticeship program is located; and (2) for all other purposes, the state approving agency for the state in which the apprenticeship program takes place. (Sec. 3) The bill eliminates the requirement that the veteran or other eligible person enrolled in an apprenticeship or other on-job training program must certify such person's program attendance to receive a training assistance allowance.
Title
VALOR Act Veterans Apprenticeship and Labor Opportunity Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-89. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-11-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7267) |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8562) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3949. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8562-8563) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 294. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-398. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-10-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1936 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employment and training programs
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Employment and training programs
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation