US HB3944 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Church Street in Mount Vernon, Georgia, as the "Second Lieutenant Patrick Palmer Calhoun Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Church Street in Mount Vernon, Georgia, as the "Second Lieutenant Patrick Palmer Calhoun Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Mike Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-10-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4943) |
2023-10-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3944. |
2023-10-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4943-4944) |
2023-10-02 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |