US HB393 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Sunset Act of 2009 - Establishes the Federal Agency Sunset Commission to: (1) submit to Congress a schedule for review by the Commission, at least once every 12 years, of the abolishment or reorganization of each agency; (2) review and evaluate the efficiency and public need for each agency using specified criteria; (3) recommend whether each agency should be abolished or reorganized; and (4) report to Congress on all legislation introduced that would establish a new agency or a new program to be carried out by an existing agency. Requires the abolishment of any agency within one year of the Commission's review, unless the agency is reauthorized by Congress. Authorizes the deadline for abolishing an agency to be extended for an additional two years by legislation enacted by a super majority of the House of Representatives and the Senate. Terminates the Commission on December 31, 2033. Directs the Comptroller General and the Director of the Congressional Budget Office, in cooperation with the Director of the Congressional Research Service (CRS), to prepare an inventory of federal programs within each agency for the purpose of advising and assisting Congress and the Commission in carrying out the requirements of this Act.
Title
Federal Sunset Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HB311 (Related) 2009-01-08 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB534 (Related) 2009-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
HB534 (Related) 2009-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/393/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr393/BILLS-111hr393ih.pdf |