US HB3927 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XXI to allow for the blending of risk pools of children's health insurance buy-in programs with the risk pools of State child health plans under such title, and for other purposes. This bill allows a state to include in a single risk pool: (1) children enrolled in a state plan under the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP); and (2) children enrolled in a health insurance buy-in program that is run by the state and provides, at minimum, benefits identical to those provided under CHIP.
Title
To amend title XXI to allow for the blending of risk pools of children's health insurance buy-in programs with the risk pools of State child health plans under such title, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3921 (Related) 2017-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 263.
HB3927 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HJR125 (Related) 2018-01-16 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3927 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HJR125 (Related) 2018-01-16 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Child health
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3927/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3927/BILLS-115hr3927ih.pdf |