US HB3905 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act (Sec. 2) This bill declares that minerals with the National Forest System (NFS) lands in Minnesota shall not be subject to withdrawal from disposition under U.S. mineral and geothermal leasing laws unless such withdrawal is approved by an Act of Congress. (Sec. 3) The bill prohibits any extension or establishment of national monuments on NFS lands in Minnesota except by express authorization of Congress. (Sec. 4) The bill declares that certain mineral leases issued within the exterior boundaries of NFS lands in Minnesota are indeterminate preference right leases that shall be: (1) issued for an initial 20-year period; and, (2) after such period, shall be renewable for 10-year periods if the lessee has complied with the terms and conditions of the lease during the 20-year period and on the condition that, at the end of each 10-year renewal period, Interior may readjust lease terms and conditions to encourage production or to address changing conditions within the lease area. Interior may: (1) suspend operations under a lease when the lease can only be operated at a loss due to market conditions or when operations are interrupted by strikes; and (2) issue permits for the use of surface lands subject to, but not included in, the lease for the exploration, development, and use of the deposits covered by the lease. This bill applies to all such mineral leases within the exterior boundaries of NFS lands in Minnesota, including: (1) leases that are not effective as of enactment of this bill; and (2) the existing hard rock mineral leases for Superior National Forest identified as MNES-01352 and MNES-01353. The National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA) shall also apply to all such mineral leases within those boundaries. In the case of the renewal of such hard rock mineral leases, the Bureau of Land Management must complete the pending environmental assessment under NEPA within 30 days of this bill's enactment.
Title
Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Jason Lewis [R-MN] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - House - On agreeing to the Grijalva amendment (A002) H.Amdt.487 RC# 642 (Y: 182 N: 237 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-30 - House - On passage RC# 643 (Y: 216 N: 204 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - On passage RC# 643 (Y: 216 N: 204 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-30 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 216 - 204 (Roll no. 643). |
2017-11-30 | House | H.Amdt.487 On agreeing to the Grijalva amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 237 (Roll no. 642). (consideration: CR H9535) |
2017-11-30 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed with further consideration of H.R. 3905. (consideration: CR H9535-9536) |
2017-11-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further consideration of H.R. 3905 is postponed. |
2017-11-29 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-11-29 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 631, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva amendment No. 1. |
2017-11-29 | House | H.Amdt.487 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Grijalva. (consideration: CR H9510; text: CR H9510) |
2017-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 3905. |
2017-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3905. |
2017-11-29 | House | The rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. |
2017-11-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 631. (consideration: CR H9498-9512; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9498-9499) |
2017-11-29 | House | Rule H. Res. 631 passed House. |
2017-11-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 631 Reported to House. The rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill. |
2017-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312. |
2017-11-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-422. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR631 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Minnesota
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Minnesota
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats