US HB390 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-7)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-300.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-7)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-300.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Iraq and Syria Genocide Emergency Relief and Accountability Act of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill states that is U.S. policy to ensure that humanitarian, stabilization, and recovery assistance for nationals and residents of Iraq or Syria, and of communities from those countries, is directed toward ethnic and minority individuals and communities with the greatest need, including those individuals and communities that are at risk of persecution or war crimes. (Sec. 5) The Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development may provide assistance, including financial and technical assistance, to support the efforts of entities, including nongovernmental organizations with expertise in international criminal investigations and law, to address crimes of genocide, crimes against humanity, or war crimes in Iraq since January 2014 by: conducting criminal investigations, developing indigenous investigative and judicial skills to adjudicate cases consistent with due process and respect for the rule of law, and collecting and preserving evidence for use in prosecutions. The State Department shall encourage foreign governments to identify and prosecute individuals who are suspected of committing such crimes, including members of foreign terrorist organizations operating in Iraq or Syria. (Sec. 6) The State Department shall identify: threats of persecution, genocide, crimes against humanity, and war crimes against members of Iraqi or Syrian religious or ethnic groups that are minorities in Iraq or in Syria with respect to whom the Islamic State of Iraq and Syria (ISIS) has committed such crimes in Iraq or Syria since January 2014 or who are members of other persecuted religious or ethnic groups; persecuted religious and ethnic minority groups in Iraq or Syria that are at risk of forced migration and the primary reasons for such risk; humanitarian, stabilization, and recovery needs of these individuals; and entities, including faith-based entities, that are providing such assistance and the extent of U.S. assistance to or through such entities. (Sec. 7) The State Department shall provide Congress with: a description of the efforts taken and proposed to implement this bill; and an assessment of the feasibility and advisability of prosecuting individuals for acts of genocide, crimes against humanity, or war crimes in Iraq since January 2014 or in Syria since March 2011.
Title
Iraq and Syria Genocide Emergency Relief and Accountability Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-300. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-300. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9600-9601) |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 390. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Mr. Smith (NJ) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H9600-9604) |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4056 Amendment SA 4056 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4056 Amendment SA 4056 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6879; text: CR S6879) To amend the title. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4055 Amendment SA 4055 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4055 Amendment SA 4055 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6879; text: CR S6872-6873) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6876-6879) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227. |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-06-06 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4632-4633) |
2017-06-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 390. |
2017-06-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4632-4638) |
2017-06-06 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E40) |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Middle East
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Syria
Terrorism
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Middle East
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Syria
Terrorism
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity