US HB3897 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-29)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gold Star Family Support and Installation Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold Star Family Support and Installation Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Don Bacon [R]Rep. Steve Russell [R]Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]Rep. Seth Moulton [D]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]Rep. Martha McSally [R]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D]Rep. Pete Olson [R]
Rep. Tom Reed [R]Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]
Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Darren Soto [D]Rep. John Lewis [D]Rep. Henry Johnson [D]
Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Denny Heck [D]Rep. Paul Cook [R]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]
Rep. Garland Barr [R]Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Tom Rice [R]
Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. Jack Bergman [R]Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Ralph Norman [R]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. James Langevin [D]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]Rep. Jim Banks [R]Rep. David Kustoff [R]
Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]Rep. Bill Shuster [R]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]Rep. Austin Scott [R]Rep. Trent Franks [R]Rep. Sam Graves [R]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]Rep. Donald McEachin [D]Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]
Rep. Ralph Abraham [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R]Rep. David Joyce [R]
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Sean Duffy [R]Rep. Doug Collins [R]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Adrian Smith [R]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R]Rep. John Shimkus [R]Rep. Trent Kelly [R]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]
Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Karen Handel [R]Rep. Evan Jenkins [R]
Rep. David Young [R]Rep. Jody Arrington [R]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]Rep. John Moolenaar [R]
Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Sam Johnson [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
2017-11-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-07HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8545)
2017-11-07HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8545)
2017-11-07HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
2017-11-07HouseMr. Bacon asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2017-10-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2017-10-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2017-10-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2088 (Same As) 2017-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback