US HB3891 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to clarify the authority of State Medicaid fraud and abuse control units to investigate and prosecute cases of Medicaid patient abuse and neglect in any setting, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to clarify the authority of State Medicaid fraud and abuse control units to investigate and prosecute cases of Medicaid patient abuse and neglect in any setting, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-07 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-09-07 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care quality
Medicaid
State and local government operations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care quality
Medicaid
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3891/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3891/BILLS-115hr3891ih.pdf |