US HB3872 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reinstate and extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project involving the Gibson Dam. This bill authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to extend for up to six years the time period during which construction must commence on the Gibson Dam Hydroelectric Project located on the Sun River in Lewis, Clark, and Teton Counties, Montana. Additionally, FERC may reinstate the construction license if it is expired.
Title
To reinstate and extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project involving the Gibson Dam.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB490 (Related) 2018-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-219. (TXT | PDF)
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Licensing and registrations
Montana
Water storage
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Licensing and registrations
Montana
Water storage
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3872/BILLS-115hr3872ih.pdf |