US HB3859 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HSA Technical Corrections Act (Sec. 3) This bill makes technical corrections to the Homeland Security Act of 2002. The bill updates obsolete language and strikes out outdated offices and reporting requirements. References to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement are updated. The bill: (1) eliminates reference to the Office of Counternarcotics Enforcement, (2) updates a reference to the Director of Central Intelligence to read as the Director of National Intelligence, (3) strikes the provisions of the Arming Pilots Against Terrorism Act and provisions directing the President to submit a reorganization plan to implement the HSA, and (4) revises the term "Hawaiian native-serving" to read as "Native Hawaiian-serving."
Title
HSA Technical Corrections Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9041-9044) |
2015-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on the motion to suspend the rules and pass H.R. 3859, as amended. |
2015-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3859. |
2015-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9041-9045, H9045-9047) |
2015-12-08 | House | Mr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254. |
2015-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-333. |
2015-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2015-10-29 | House | Introduced in House |