US HB382 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles 23 and 49, United States Code, with respect to bikeshare projects, and for other purposes.
Title
Bikeshare Transit Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E57) |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2579 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2579 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr382/BILLS-117hr382ih.pdf |