US HB3810 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the federal-aid highway program to modify the minimum penalties states are required to impose on motorists convicted multiple times for driving while intoxicated or under the influence of alcohol. Requires repeat offenders to have: (1) all their driving privileges suspended (currently, a driver's license suspension) for at least one year; or (2) their unlimited driving privileges suspended for one year, with limited driving privileges permitted, subject to restrictions and limited exemptions established under state law, if an ignition interlock device is installed for at least one year on each of the motor vehicles they own or operate. Eliminates the current alternative of a combination of suspension of all driving privileges for the first 45 days of the suspension period followed by a reinstatement of limited driving privileges for the purpose of getting to and from work, school, or an alcohol treatment program if an ignition interlock device is installed on each of the motor vehicles owned or operated, or both, by the individual.
Title
To amend title 23, United States Code, to modify a provision relating to minimum penalties for repeat offenders for driving while intoxicated or driving under the influence, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2012-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1813 (Related) 2012-04-24 - See also H.R. 4348.
SB1816 (Related) 2011-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB14 (Related) 2012-03-21 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
SB1816 (Related) 2011-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB14 (Related) 2012-03-21 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Subjects
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Licensing and registrations
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Licensing and registrations
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3810/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3810/BILLS-112hr3810ih.pdf |