US HB3808 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-12-1)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the withdrawal and study of the Federal Housing Finance Agency's proposed rule on Federal Home Loan Bank membership, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Federal Housing Finance Agency to withdraw its proposed rule entitled "Members of Federal Home Loan Banks" (September 12, 2014). The Government Accountability Office shall report to certain congressional committees on the impact of the rule upon the Federal Home Loan Bank System and financial intermediaries.
Title
To require the withdrawal and study of the Federal Housing Finance Agency's proposed rule on Federal Home Loan Bank membership, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1484 (Related) 2015-07-23 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Federal Housing Finance Agency
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Federal Housing Finance Agency
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3808/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3808/BILLS-114hr3808ih.pdf |