US HB3801 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to pay a basic needs allowance to a regular member of the Army, Navy, Marine Corps, or Air Force who is low-income and meets other specified requirements. Specifically, DOD must pay the allowance to such a service member who (1) has completed initial entry training, (2) has a gross household income during the most recent year that does not exceed an amount equal to 130% of the federal poverty guidelines, (3) submits required information to DOD, and (4) does not elect against receiving the allowance for a given year. For purposes of determining eligibility, gross household income does not include any basic allowance for housing received during the year by the service member or by any dependents of the service member in the household. In the event a household contains two or more service members entitled to receive the allowance, only one allowance may be paid in a given year. DOD must annually notify potentially eligible service members and provide them with information on DOD financial management and assistance programs.
Title
Military Hunger Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-07-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3801/BILLS-116hr3801ih.pdf |