US HB3799 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable Access to Prescription Medications Act of 2009 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to prescription drug plans, to limit the required co-payment or coinsurance for any one prescription to $200, and for all prescriptions in any month to $500. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), for plan years beginning on or after January 1, 2011, to expand the formulary tier exception request process to allow Medicare beneficiaries enrolled in a prescription drug plan to request an exception for a specialty prescription drug as a non-preferred prescription drug. Requires the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission to study and report to Congress on: (1) the prescription drug program under Medicare part D and the interaction of such program with Medicare beneficiary access to covered drugs under part B; and (2) cost-sharing for prescription drugs under Medicare parts B and D, including an analysis of the impact of eliminating cost-sharing for covered part D drugs for Medicare beneficiaries who incur annual out-of-pocket cost-sharing, after the initial coverage limit, that exceeds 5% of their income and who do not otherwise qualify for an income-related subsidy or other extra help or cost-sharing relief.
Title
Affordable Access to Prescription Medications Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI] |
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-10-13 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-10-13 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-10-13 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-10-13 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1630 (Same As) 2009-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9027-9029)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee benefits and pensions
Government investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee benefits and pensions
Government investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3799/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3799/BILLS-111hr3799ih.pdf |