US HB3790 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend increased dependency and indemnity compensation paid to surviving spouses of veterans who die from amyotrophic lateral sclerosis, regardless of how long the veterans had such disease prior to death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice for ALS Veterans Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
2023-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-11-29HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2023-11-29HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-07-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2023-06-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2023-06-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1590 (Related) 2023-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback