US HB379 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Partners Next Door Act of 2011 - Amends the National Housing Act to provide: (1) a 50% discount for teachers, teacher assistants, administrators, and public safety officers purchasing certain eligible asset properties for use as their primary residence; (2) a $100 downpayment on any related insured mortgage; and (3) a higher Federal Housing Administration (FHA) loan limit for such purchases in high-cost areas. Authorizes such sales directly to a qualifying individual or to a unit of local government or a nonprofit organization for resale to such individual. Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to carry out a program to inform teachers and public safety officers about such program.
Title
Community Partners Next Door Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity. |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2986 (Related) 2011-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
HB3649 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
HB3649 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Law enforcement officers
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Law enforcement officers
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr379/BILLS-112hr379ih.pdf |