US HB378 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017
Title
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-10-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7948-7949) |
2017-10-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 378. |
2017-10-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7948-7950) |
2017-10-11 | House | Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-10-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246. |
2017-10-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-341. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1830 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics