US HB3779 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to enter into agreements with any state or Indian tribal government to make capitalization grants for the establishment of hazard mitigation revolving loan funds. Such funds shall provide funding assistance to local governments to carry out projects to reduce disaster risk in order to decrease the loss of life and property, the cost of insurance claims, and federal disaster payments.
Title
Resilience Revolving Loan Fund Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 389. |
2020-09-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-486. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3418 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-284.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Guam
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Roads and highways
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Virgin Islands
Watersheds
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Guam
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Roads and highways
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Virgin Islands
Watersheds