US HB3765 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 198 Baker Street in Corning, New York, as the "Specialist Ryan P. Jayne Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 198 Baker Street in Corning, New York, as the "Specialist Ryan P. Jayne Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-153. |
2014-08-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5391) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3765. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5391-5392) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2057 (Same As) 2014-07-14 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service