US HB3764 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 663.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 663.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tribal Recognition Act of 2016 This bill replaces the process for federal recognition of Indian tribes. Indian groups may only be recognized as an Indian tribe by Congress. Groups that are not federally recognized may submit a petition for federal recognition to the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) and may file a letter of intent in advance. Groups may not be factions of recognized Indian tribes and may not have been denied federal recognition.
Title
Tribal Recognition Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 663. |
2016-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-847. |
2016-09-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13. |
2016-09-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-07 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2015-12-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held (Part II). |
2015-10-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held (Part I). |
2015-10-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |