US HB3749 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make grants to eligible entities that provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness. To be eligible, an entity must (1) be a public or nonprofit private entity with the capacity to effectively administer a grant, (2) demonstrate that adequate financial support will be available to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness, and (3) agree to meet the VA's established requirements and demonstrate a capacity to meet such requirements. The bill requires the VA to (1) use a specified portion of the grants to provide legal services to women veterans, and (2) report on areas where VA programs are failing to meet the needs of women veterans who are homeless.
Title
Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1177) |
2020-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3749. |
2020-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1176-1179) |
2020-02-25 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Lawyers and legal services
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Congressional oversight
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Lawyers and legal services
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs