US HB373 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to implement a process to provide eligible organizations and individuals expedited access to federal land to conduct good Samaritan search-and-recovery missions, which are searches for one or more missing individuals believed to be deceased at the time that the search is initiated. The bill sets forth procedures for the approval or denial of requests made by eligible organizations or individuals to carry out a good Samaritan search-and-recovery mission. Interior and USDA shall develop search-and-recovery focused partnerships with search-and-recovery organizations to coordinate good Samaritan search-and-recovery missions, and expedite and accelerate mission efforts for missing individuals.
Title
Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-193. |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 174). (text: CR H2485-2486) |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2489-2490) |
2015-04-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 373. |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2485-2487) |
2015-04-28 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 54. |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-75, Part I. |
2015-03-25 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats