US HB371 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a moratorium on Federal funding to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
Title
Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H269-270) |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB128 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/371/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr371/BILLS-118hr371ih.pdf |