US HB3704 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native Health Access Improvement Act of 2017 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Indian Health Service (IHS) to award grants to Indian health facilities for the prevention and treatment of mental health and substance use disorders. The IHS must establish a technical assistance center for grantees. In addition, this bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to define “Indian” for purposes of health insurance reform, exchanges, and subsidies. The definition includes individuals of Indian descent who are members of an Indian community served by the IHS and individuals considered by the Department of Health and Human Services to be Indian for purposes of eligibility for Indian health care services. Individuals included in the definition are eligible for special monthly enrollment periods on health insurance exchanges and elimination of cost sharing under individual health coverage for those whose income is not more than 300% of the poverty line. Under current law, only members of Indian tribes are eligible for these benefits. The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt Indians, as defined by this bill, from the requirement to maintain minimum essential health coverage.
Title
Native Health Access Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2545 (Related) 2018-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Comprehensive health care
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
Comprehensive health care
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3704/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3704/BILLS-115hr3704ih.pdf |