US HB3702 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for certain procedures related to the Community Development Block Grant - Disaster Recovery (CDBR-DR) Program and adds new program requirements, including with respect to coordination of benefits, precertification for grant assistance, and allocation of grant funds. Additionally, the bill expands CDBG-DR assistance to Puerto Rico. Finally, the bill establishes the Community Development Block Grant Disaster Recovery Reserve Fund.
Title
Reforming Disaster Recovery Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 625 (Y: 290 N: 118 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 290 - 118 (Roll no. 625). (text: CR H8914-8917) |
2019-11-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8939-8940) |
2019-11-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3702. |
2019-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8914-8926) |
2019-11-18 | House | Mr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0. |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing industry and standards
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Latin America
Natural disasters
Puerto Rico
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Right of privacy
State and local finance
User charges and fees
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing industry and standards
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Latin America
Natural disasters
Puerto Rico
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Right of privacy
State and local finance
User charges and fees