US HB37 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 90-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act This bill amends the federal criminal code to require any health care practitioner who is present when a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion to: (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to any other child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) ensure that such child is immediately admitted to a hospital. The term "born alive" means the complete expulsion or extraction from his or her mother, at any stage of development, who after such expulsion or extraction breathes or has a beating heart, pulsation of the umbilical cord, or definite movement of voluntary muscles, regardless of whether the umbilical cord has been cut. Also, a health care practitioner or other employee who has knowledge of a failure to comply with these requirements must immediately report such failure to an appropriate law enforcement agency. An individual who violates the provisions of this bill is subject to a criminal fine, up to five years in prison, or both. An individual who commits an overt act that kills a child born alive is subject to criminal prosecution for murder. The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony. A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.
Title
Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB220 (Same As) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4712 (Same As) 2018-01-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR694 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4712 (Same As) 2018-01-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR694 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Abortion
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/37/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr37/BILLS-115hr37ih.pdf |