US HB3695 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends until January 31, 2014: (1) specified agricultural programs under the Food, Conservation, and Energy Act of 2008, (2) suspension of permanent price support authorities, and (3) supplemental agricultural disaster assistance. Exempts from such extensions: (1) mandatory funding for nutrition education; (2) the conservation stewardship program, the farmland protection program, the environmental quality incentives program, and the wildlife habitat incentives program; (3) Commodity Credit Corporation funding for local and regional food aid procurement projects, the McGovern-Dole International Food for Education and Child Nutrition Program, and a survey of foods purchased by school food authorities; (4) rural development programs for micro entrepreneur assistance, pending rural development loans and grants, value-added agricultural market development grants, and the National Sheep Industry Improvement Center; (5) market loss assistance for asparagus producers; (6) supplemental agricultural disaster assistance; (7) Pigford claims determinations; and (8) specified requirements of the Heartland, Habitat, Harvest, and Horticulture Act of 2008 relating to supplemental agricultural disaster assistance, revenue and tax, and trade. Backdates the effective date of this Act to September 30, 2013.
Title
To provide a temporary extension of the Food, Conservation, and Energy Act of 2008 and amendments made by that Act, as previously extended and amended and with certain additional modifications and exceptions, to suspend permanent price support authorities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
2013-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8046) |
2013-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3695. |
2013-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8046-8047) |
2013-12-12 | House | Mr. Lucas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
HR438 (Related) 2013-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.