US HB3683 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-4)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2015 This bill requires the Department of the Interior to establish within the National Park Service (NPS) a U.S. Civil Rights Network that encompasses: (1) all NPS units and programs that relate to the African American civil rights movement during the period from 1939 through 1968; (2) other federal, state, local, and privately owned properties that relate to the African American civil rights movement and that are included in, or eligible for, the National Register of Historic Places; and (3) other governmental and nongovernmental facilities and programs of an educational, research, or interpretive nature that are directly related to such movement. In carrying out the Network, Interior must: (1) review civil rights movement studies and reports that may already be underway or completed, such as the Civil Rights Framework Study; (2) produce and disseminate educational materials, such as handbooks, maps, interpretive guides, or electronic information; (3) provide technical assistance; and (4) adopt an official, uniform symbol or device for the Network and issue regulations for the symbol's use.
Title
African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2309 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Protest and dissent
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Protest and dissent
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3683/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3683/BILLS-114hr3683ih.pdf |