US HB368 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Became Public Law No: 112-51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Became Public Law No: 112-51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removal Clarification Act of 2011 - (Sec. 2) Revises the federal judicial code to provide that a civil action or criminal prosecution that is commenced in a state court and that is against or directed to the United States or a federal agency or officer, or specified others, may be removed to an appropriate U.S. district court. Declares that civil actions and criminal prosecutions include any proceeding (whether or not ancillary to another proceeding) to the extent that in such proceeding a judicial order, including a subpoena for testimony or documents, is sought or issued. Limits removal of such a proceeding, if there is no other basis for removal, to only that specific proceeding, with the remainder of the civil action or criminal proceeding to remain in state court. Declares that the 30-day notice of removal requirement shall be satisfied in any such civil or criminal proceeding in which such a judicial order is sought, or issued, or sought to be enforced, if the person or entity desiring to remove the proceeding files notice of removal not later than 30 days after receiving, through service, notice of the proceeding.
Title
Removal Clarification Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 396 N: 4 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-51. |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6925) |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197. |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-02-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 4 (Roll no. 150). (text: CR H1371) |
2011-02-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1375-1376) |
2011-02-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-02-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 368. |
2011-02-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1371-1372) |
2011-02-28 | House | Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-02-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8. |
2011-02-28 | House | Committee on The Budget discharged. |
2011-02-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-17, Part I. |
2011-01-26 | House | Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged. |
2011-01-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-01-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law. |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Law