US HB3668 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counterfeit Drug Penalty Enhancement Act of 2012 - Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit and to establish criminal penalties for trafficking, or attempting to traffic, in counterfeit drugs. Directs: (1) the Attorney General to give increased priority to efforts to investigate and prosecute offenses that involve trafficking in counterfeit drugs; and (2) the United States Sentencing Commission to review and, if appropriate, amend its guidelines and policy statements applicable to persons convicted of such offense to reflect congressional intent that penalties be increased to reflect the serious nature of such offense and the need for an effective deterrent and to account for the resulting harm to the public.
Title
Counterfeit Drug Penalty Enhancement Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Chip Cravaack [R-MN] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY] |
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] | Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-06-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-06-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3719) |
2012-06-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3668. |
2012-06-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3719-3721) |
2012-06-18 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-06-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385. |
2012-06-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-537. |
2012-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2012-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-06-05 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2012-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-01-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2011-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3468 (Related) 2011-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1886 (Related) 2012-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1886 (Related) 2012-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Prescription drugs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Prescription drugs