US HB3649 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a pilot program to furnish hyperbaric oxygen therapy to a veteran who has a traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder.
Title
Veterans National Traumatic Brain Injury Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3649/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3649/BILLS-118hr3649ih.pdf |