US HB3636 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Caring For Our Women Veterans Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caring For Our Women Veterans Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-07-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-07-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB514 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback