US HB3636 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
O-VISA Act Oversee Visa Integrity with Stakeholder Advisories Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require the Department of Homeland Security to give a copy of any decision regarding the nonimmigrant O-1 visa admission of an alien seeking to work in a motion picture or television production (or an accompanying O-2 visa alien involved in such production) to the labor union and management organizations that have provided advisory opinions with respect to such admission.
Title
O-VISA Act Oversee Visa Integrity with Stakeholder Advisories Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-06-13 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3719) |
2016-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3636. |
2016-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3719-3721) |
2016-06-13 | House | Mrs. Walters, Mimi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 477. |
2016-06-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-614. |
2016-05-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Labor-management relations
Television and film
Visas and passports
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Labor-management relations
Television and film
Visas and passports