US HB361 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act - (Sec. 2) Designates certain land in the Mount Baker-Snoqualmie National Forest in the state of Washington, which shall be considered to become a part of the Alpine Lakes Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Declares that this Act shall have no effect on overflights of military aircraft or the authority to carry out wildfire prevention activities. (Sec. 3) Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate segments of the Middle Fork Snoqualmie River as wild and scenic rivers and the entirety of the Pratt River as a wild river. Prohibits acquisition by condemnation of any land or interest in land within the boundaries of such river segments and excludes private or non-federal public property unless the owner of the property has consented in writing to having it included. (Sec. 4) Prohibits anything in this Act from: (1) establishing a protective perimeter or buffer zone around the boundaries of the wild and scenic river segments or wilderness designated by this Act, or (2) restricting an activity from being conducted outside such boundaries.
Title
Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-686. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-30 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats