US HB3607 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish fees for medical services provided in units of the National Park System, and for other purposes. This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to establish and collect fees for medical services provided to persons in units of the National Park System. The bill establishes the National Park Medical Services Fund, to consist of donations and the fees collected for such services and to be available to Interior for: providing such services; preparing programmatic analyses and developing management plans for medical facilities, equipment, vehicles, and other needs for, and costs of, such services; providing training related to furnishing such services; and obtaining or improving medical facilities, equipment, vehicles, and other needs and costs of such services.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish fees for medical services provided in units of the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3320) |
2018-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3607. |
2018-04-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3320-3321) |
2018-04-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426. |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-565. |
2017-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-10-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-08-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
Subjects
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health facilities and institutions
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Health care costs and insurance
Health facilities and institutions
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees