US HB3595 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the process for awarding grants under certain programs of the Department of Agriculture to certain counties in which the majority of land is owned or managed by the Federal Government and to other units of local government and Tribal governments in those counties, and for other purposes.
Title
MORE USDA Grants Act More Opportunities for Rural Economies from USDA Grants Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development. |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1580 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB6891 (Same As) 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
HB6891 (Same As) 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3595/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3595/BILLS-118hr3595ih.pdf |