US HB359 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To establish Fort San Gerónimo del Boquerón in Puerto Rico as an affiliated area of the National Park System, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fort San Gerónimo Preservation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 600 (Y: 359 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2023-11-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2023-11-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-11-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 359 - 24 (Roll no. 600). (text: CR H5414-5415)
2023-11-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5426-5427)
2023-11-06HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2023-11-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 359.
2023-11-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5414-5416)
2023-11-06HouseMr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2023-11-03HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212.
2023-11-03HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-263.
2023-05-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2023-05-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-05-17HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2023-02-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-01-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-01-13HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback