US HB359 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy to facilitate and encourage public-private partnerships in order to address and mitigate the physical security and cybersecurity risks of electric utilities.
Title
Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4969-4970) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 359. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4969-4971) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202. |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-254. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2095 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation