US HB3588 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Fire Safety Act of 2013 - Amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to exempt fire hydrants from certain prohibitions against the use of lead pipes, solder, and flux. Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to: (1) consult with and seek the advice of the National Drinking Water Advisory Council on potential changes to federal regulations pertaining to lead; and (2) request the Council to consider sources of lead throughout drinking water distribution systems, including through components used to reroute drinking water during distribution system repairs.
Title
Community Fire Safety Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-02 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 384 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-64. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8899-8900) |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-12-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 613). (text: CR H7371-7372) |
2013-12-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7374) |
2013-12-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3588. |
2013-12-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7371-7373) |
2013-12-02 | House | Mr. Johnson (OH) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3542 (Related) 2013-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
SB1779 (Same As) 2013-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1824 (Related) 2013-12-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 261.
SB1779 (Same As) 2013-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1824 (Related) 2013-12-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 261.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Water quality
Water use and supply