US HB3581 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to modify the family caregiver program of the Department of Veterans Affairs to include services related to mental health and neurological disorders, and for other purposes.
Title
COPE Act Caregiver Outreach and Program Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-12-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-12-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3581. |
2023-12-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-12-04 | House | Mr. Bergman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-10-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201. |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-251. |
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2023-06-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB2683 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
HB2683 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held