US HB3553 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Earned Income Tax Credit Equity for Puerto Act of 2015 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make citizens of Puerto Rico eligible for the federal earned income tax credit.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit Equity for Puerto Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2203 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3552 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4213 (Related) 2015-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2675 (Related) 2016-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1465-1466)
SB3044 (Related) 2016-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3552 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4213 (Related) 2015-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2675 (Related) 2016-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1465-1466)
SB3044 (Related) 2016-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3553/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3553/BILLS-114hr3553ih.pdf |