US HB3553 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-12 - Became Public Law No: 111-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-12 - Became Public Law No: 111-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010 - Amends the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996 to exclude from consideration as income any amounts received by a family from the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) as veterans' disability compensation or dependency and indemnity compensation for service-related disabilities of a member of the family.
Title
Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-12 | Became Public Law No: 111-269. | |
2010-10-12 | Signed by President. | |
2010-09-30 | Presented to President. | |
2010-09-28 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-09-27 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-09-27 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7556) | |
2010-09-22 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579. | |
2010-09-22 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. With written report No. 111-299. | |
2010-06-30 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-04-22 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. | |
2010-04-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-04-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2654) | |
2010-04-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3553. | |
2010-04-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2654-2656) | |
2010-04-20 | Mr. Cleaver moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-09-10 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3246 (Related) 2010-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2589)
Subjects
Disability assistance
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Indian social and development programs
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Indian social and development programs
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' pensions and compensation