US HB3542 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hamas Human Shields Prevention Act (Sec. 3) This bill states that it is U.S. policy to condemn Hamas's use of human shields and act against those engaging in or supporting the use of human shields. (Sec. 4) The President is urged to direct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the United Nations (U.N.) to use U.S. influence at the Security Council to secure support for a resolution: (1) imposing multilateral sanctions against Hamas's use of human shields; and (2) specifying steps to prevent, and consequences for, the use of U.N. employees as human shields or facilities that enable that use. (Sec. 5) The President shall prohibit property transactions and U.S. entry (and revoke current visas) with respect to: (1) each foreign person or entity that is a member of or acting on behalf of Hamas and that is responsible for or complicit in Hamas's unlawful attempt to use civilians, civilian property, or other protected persons to shield military objectives from lawful attack; and (2) each foreign person or entity and each agency or instrumentality of a foreign state that has significantly facilitated or attempted to facilitate such an act. The President may waive a sanction for 180 days with prior congressional certification that such waiver is in U.S. national security interests.
Title
Hamas Human Shields Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 74 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-02-14 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 74). (text: CR 2/13/2018 H1083-1084) |
2018-02-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1146) |
2018-02-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3542. |
2018-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1083-1087) |
2018-02-13 | House | Mr. Wilson (SC) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3257 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
Middle East
Palestinians
Sanctions
Terrorism
United Nations
Visas and passports
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
Middle East
Palestinians
Sanctions
Terrorism
United Nations
Visas and passports