US HB3540 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Chesapeake Bay Office of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Science, Education, and Ecosystem Enhancement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-573. |
2022-02-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1816 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.