US HB3539 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration (SAMHSA) to develop best practices for schools to establish behavioral intervention teams (i.e., experts who are responsible for identifying individuals of concern and addressing associated behavioral health issues so as to prevent harm to the individual or others). SAMHSA must also develop a list of providers with threat-assessment training to help school personnel implement the best practices.
Title
Behavioral Intervention Guidelines Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5021) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3539. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5021-5023) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 440. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-540. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Child health
Crime prevention
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Higher education
Mental health
Right of privacy
Crime prevention
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Higher education
Mental health
Right of privacy