US HB3535 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Avoiding Life-Endangering and Reckless Texting by Drivers Act of 2009 or the ALERT Drivers Act - Requires the Secretary of Transportation to withhold 25% of a state's apportionment of certain federal-aid highway program funds for the fiscal year if the state has not enacted or is not enforcing a law that: (1) prohibits, except in an emergency, an operator of a motor vehicle from writing, sending, or reading a text message using a hand-held mobile telephone (excluding a vehicle-integrated, voice-activated device); and (2) requires, upon conviction of a violation of such prohibition, the imposition of certain minimum penalties.
Title
ALERT Drivers Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Adler [D-NJ] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Massa [D-NY] |
Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3820 (Related) 2010-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3829 (Related) 2009-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB4153 (Related) 2009-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5097 (Related) 2010-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1536 (Related) 2009-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3829 (Related) 2009-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB4153 (Related) 2009-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5097 (Related) 2010-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1536 (Related) 2009-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Roads and highways
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3535/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3535/BILLS-111hr3535ih.pdf |